INTEGRITY HARVESTFIELD UNITED PENTECOSTAL CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1149554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 03 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 13 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 27 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 18 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required