INTEGRITY HARVESTFIELD UNITED PENTECOSTAL CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1149554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £5.18k £4.79k £2.66k £2.17k £5.06k
Total expenditure £3.00k £2.46k £2.62k £1.96k £4.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A