LONDON FESTIVAL OF BULGARIAN CULTURE LIMITED

Charity number: 1157169
Charity reporting is overdue by 578 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 213 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 213 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 578 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 578 days
Annual return 30 June 2018 07 August 2019 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 05 June 2018 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 14 June 2017 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required