Accounts and annual returns BRITISH SCOUTING OVERSEAS AREA SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1151702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 25 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window