Trustees BRITISH SCOUTING OVERSEAS AREA SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1151702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Maria Warne MSc BSc Chair 02 October 2021
None on record
Firas Al Amri Trustee 19 September 2020
None on record
Alice Katherine Mintoff Trustee 19 September 2020
None on record
Sarah Webber Trustee 19 September 2020
None on record
Charlotte Emma Thompson Trustee 19 September 2020
None on record
Nathan Prince Trustee 18 September 2020
None on record
JOHN PETER BROXIS Trustee 20 July 2019
None on record
Sandro Pace-Bonello Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
REBECCA FELGATE Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
YASMA OSMAN Trustee 15 July 2017
None on record
MATT LIGHTFOOT Trustee 26 September 2015
None on record
Ben Balaam Trustee 07 September 2014
None on record
JAN MILLER Trustee 27 September 2013
None on record
David Bull OBE Trustee 14 October 2012
CHESTER DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: 192 days late
CHESTER PLUS
Received: On time
1ST UPTON-BY-CHESTER SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time