THE FEDERATION OF EUROPEAN BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETIES

Charity number: 1149638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £10.74m £6.30m £6.72m £6.69m £7.11m
Total expenditure £1.99m £2.97m £3.13m £3.30m £4.91m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.36k £7.77k £7.52k £7.72k £7.12k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £10.38m £5.78m £6.08m £6.08m £6.24m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £351.03k £509.03k £634.27k £602.27k £837.85k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £20.51k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.81m £2.75m £2.93m £2.93m £4.55m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £220.14k £196.09k £370.89k £362.27k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £131.34k £218.49k £300.20k £401.98k £433.64k
Expenditure - Investment management £182.18k £220.14k £196.09k £370.89k £362.27k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0