THE FEDERATION OF EUROPEAN BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETIES

Charity number: 1149638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Piotr Laidler Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Professor Emmanouil Fragkoulis Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
PROFESSOR BEATA VERTESSY Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
PROFESSOR Ferhan Girgin Sagin Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Professor Vaclav Paces Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
Professor Johannes Buchner Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Dr Irene Diaz Moreno Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
Professor Janko Kos Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
PROFESSOR MIGUEL ANGEL DE LA ROSA Trustee 31 January 2013 None on record
PROFESSOR LASZLO FESUS Trustee 07 November 2012 None on record
Professor Frank Michelangeli Trustee 14 September 2016 None on record
PROFESSOR CECILIA ARRAIANO Trustee 27 February 2014 None on record
Professor Alain Krol Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
Professor Jerka Dumic Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record