SUPPORTING WOUNDED VETERANS LTD.

Charity number: 1149727
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 16 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 23 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 26 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 26 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 14 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 14 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 13 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 13 January 2017 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)