BRASS FOR AFRICA

Charity number: 1149863
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 15 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 12 December 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)