Accounts and annual returns NOAM EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1151459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 06 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 July 2020 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 July 2018 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 12 July 2018 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2016 10 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 31 July 2017 1 days late Download Open in new window