Financial history NOAM EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1151459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £25.04k £152.51k £524.87k £3.14m £1.92m
Total expenditure £4.19k £1.73k £147.19k £552.98k £476.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £524.83k £3.05m £1.90m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £85.23k £20.57k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £42 £33 £29
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £147.19k £514.08k £475.47k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £38.90k £1.50k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £3.34k £6.44k £7.26k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £133.50k £507.64k £464.01k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0