CATS IN CRISIS LINCOLN

Charity number: 1150145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 28 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 28 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 06 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 12 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 12 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 27 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 27 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 11 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 December 2016 On time Download