THE DEVELOP AFRICA TRUST

Charity number: 1149842
Charity reporting is overdue by 171 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 171 days
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 171 days
Annual return 10 October 2019 12 September 2020 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 10 October 2018 12 September 2020 399 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 10 October 2017 14 August 2018 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 10 October 2016 20 September 2017 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2016 Not Required