NIGHT CHURCH HASTINGS

Charity number: 1150033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £1.95k £1.88k £739 £781 £460
Total expenditure £2.61k £1.30k £1.25k £773 £356
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A