BEXHILL STREET PASTORS

Charity number: 1150480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.72k £11.68k £7.24k £8.37k £3.03k
Total expenditure £9.02k £10.70k £8.34k £6.26k £2.26k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A