ARUNDEL CASTLE CRICKET FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1150351
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 05 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 05 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 08 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 08 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 18 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 18 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 08 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 08 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 10 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 09 August 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)