AFRICAN THEATRE ASSOCIATION (AFTA)

Charity number: 1154729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 August 2020 02 June 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2019 15 December 2020 197 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2018 14 December 2020 562 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2017 14 December 2020 927 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2016 14 December 2020 1292 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2016 Not Required