AFRICAN THEATRE ASSOCIATION (AFTA)

Charity number: 1154729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/08/2016 01/08/2017 01/08/2018 01/08/2019 01/08/2020
Total gross income £3.69k £5.59k £2.49k £3.92k £3.14k
Total expenditure £2.21k £4.78k £3.16k £4.63k £3.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A