BLACKBURN FOODBANK

Charity number: 1151310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 15 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 15 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 09 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 09 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 06 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 06 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 25 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 25 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 27 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 27 February 2017 On time