FRANCISCAN SERVANTS OF MARY TRUST

Charity number: 1150400
Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 99 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 99 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 Overdue Overdue by 464 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Overdue Overdue by 464 days
Annual return 31 October 2018 Overdue Overdue by 830 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Overdue Overdue by 830 days
Annual return 31 October 2017 26 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 15 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required