FRANCISCAN SERVANTS OF MARY TRUST

Charity number: 1150400
Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2013 31/10/2014 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017
Total gross income £20.87k £17.00k £24.25k £21.70k £22.35k
Total expenditure £23.55k £20.14k £20.50k £18.64k £18.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0