MARSHFIELD CHAPEL

Charity number: 1150205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £24.03k £24.03k £24.14k £20.78k £16.37k
Total expenditure £20.22k £20.34k £22.81k £19.87k £16.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £300 £300 £300 N/A N/A