WEST HOWE COMMUNITY ENTERPRISES

Charity number: 1157732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 03 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 03 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 12 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 12 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 10 May 2018 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 10 May 2018 10 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 16 May 2017 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 16 May 2017 16 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2015 07 March 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 07 March 2016 On time Download