WEST HOWE COMMUNITY ENTERPRISES

Charity number: 1157732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £90.50k £73.98k £91.60k £75.78k £139.02k
Total expenditure £56.52k £77.01k £77.96k £73.60k £76.24k
Income from government contracts £6.21k £15.62k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £34.05k N/A N/A