THE TRIMLEY STATION COMMUNITY TRUST LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve for the benefit of the people of East Anglia and of the Nation, the historical, architectural and constructional heritage that may exist in and around East Anglia in buildings of particular beauty or historical,architectural or constructional interest, to advance education and provide facilities for social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 19 April 2013: Standard registration
- 23 October 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.54k | £7.08k | £2.42k | £1.44k | £125 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.19k | £2.18k | £2.02k | £582 | £6.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 JAN 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF EAST ANGLIA AND OF THE NATION, THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE THAT MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND EAST ANGLIA IN BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY STRUCTURE OR ERECTION, AND ANY PART OF A BUILDING AS SO DEFINED) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF TRIMLEY ST MARY, TRIMLEY ST MARTIN, FELIXSTOWE, KIRTON OR THE RESIDENTS OF SUFFOLK WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN THE COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AT TRIMLEY RAILWAY STATION, OR ELSEWHERE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window