Accounts and annual returns THE NATIONAL FUNDING SCHEME

Charity number: 1149800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 01 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 01 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 09 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 09 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 25 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 25 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 28 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 28 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2016 20 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 19 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window