THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARTHOLOMEW, EDGBASTON

Charity number: 1149853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 16 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 03 August 2017 On time Download