THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARTHOLOMEW, EDGBASTON

Charity number: 1149853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTOPHER JOHN STOTTS Trustee 20 November 2012 None on record
David John Mayland Trustee 07 February 2019 None on record
MRS Judy Metcalfe Trustee 19 April 2015 None on record
Dr JOSEPH ALLAN JORDAN Trustee 20 November 2012
WARWICKSHIRE MASONIC BENEVOLENT FUND Received: On time
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR COLPOSCOPY AND CERVICAL PATHOLOGY Received: 22 days late
THE BIRMINGHAM BIG ART FOUNDATION Received: On time
MOSELEY RUGBY COMMUNITY FOUNDATION Received: On time
GILLIAN MARY HORTON MACMILLAN Trustee 20 November 2012 None on record
Benjamin John Cuffin-Munday Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
PETER LESLIE TAYLOR Trustee 19 April 2016 None on record
Margaret Diane Turner Trustee 13 April 2014 None on record
Nick Tucker Chair 01 September 2015 None on record
George Stuart Mitchell Trustee 19 April 2015 None on record
WILLIAM GUY SHUBRA HORDERN Trustee 20 November 2012
THE BLUE COAT SCHOOL BIRMINGHAM LIMITED Received: On time
Dr JOHN ASHTON Trustee 20 November 2012
ANGLICAN CHAPLAINCY TRUST Received: On time
Isobel Harris Trustee 16 May 2016 None on record