ST MARYS INDIAN ORTHODOX CONGREGATION OXFORD

Charity number: 1149906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £10.76k £21.98k £11.71k £11.42k £13.15k
Total expenditure £9.66k £7.47k £11.35k £9.21k £11.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A