WHITCHURCH AND GANAREW MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 503264
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £18.30k £19.57k £16.95k £19.33k £21.07k
Total expenditure £13.45k £18.60k £13.78k £17.35k £14.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A