NEWCASTLE STAFFS FOODBANK

Charity number: 1150816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2020 04 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2020 04 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 August 2019 17 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2018 15 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2017 10 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2016 12 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2016 Not Required