NEWCASTLE STAFFS FOODBANK

Charity number: 1150816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Simon Roger Boxall Chair 15 October 2015 None on record
Julian Mark Rowley Trustee 07 December 2020 None on record
Michael Heap Trustee 30 July 2019 None on record
Peter James Radford Trustee 20 May 2019 None on record
Sheila May Heap Trustee 08 March 2021 None on record
Rev John Jorge Beswick Pallister Trustee 24 October 2019 None on record
John Machin Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record