COACTIVE ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities to advance the education and health of people with learning disabilities, development and inclusion, via the performing arts and other art forms and to increase opportunities for such persons to participate in the arts. To develop the skills of beneficiaries in such a way that they are better able to identify, and help meet, their needs and to participate more fully in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Wakefield
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 13 February 2013: Standard registration
- COACTIVE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert William Waft | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gustaf Taylor-Thomas | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashton Victor Howick | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Crossfield | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Alexandra Love | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.12k | £60.15k | £43.37k | £90.53k | £77.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.83k | £65.93k | £57.47k | £67.33k | £84.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £45.38k | £7.98k | £37.17k | £20.56k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 12 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/01/2013
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND HEALTH OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PEOPLE ON THE AUTISTIC SPECTRUM AND OTHER PEOPLE WHO EXPERIENCE SIMILAR BARRIERS TO LEARNING, DEVELOPMENT AND INCLUSION (THE BENEFICIARIES), VIA THE PERFORMING ARTS AND OTHER ART FORMS AND TO INCREASE OPPORTUNITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS TO PARTICIPATE IN THE ARTS. 2) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONGST THE BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF THEIR DISABILITY THROUGH THE USE OF THE PERFORMING ARTS AND OTHER ART FORMS IN ORDER TO ADVANCE EQUALITY, DIVERSITY AND INCLUSIVITY WITHIN SOCIETY. 3) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES (A SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF INTEREST) IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wakefield Baptist Church
Belle Isle Avenue
WAKEFIELD
West Yorkshire
WF1 5JY
- Phone:
- 07942700006
- Email:
- info@coactive.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window