Financial history THE CONVERSATION TRUST (UK) LIMITED

Charity number: 1151436
Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £1.22m £1.33m £1.40m £1.55m £1.94m
Total expenditure £1.18m £1.27m £1.39m £1.40m £1.69m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £105.07k £30.00k £82.43k £369.70k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.22m £119.48k £39.43k £151.48k £606.69k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £90.00k £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £1.15m £1.36m £1.31m £1.34m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £73 £232 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £60.00k £0 £3.06k £1.37k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.18m £1.27m £1.39m £1.40m £1.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £20.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0