LAVENDER HILL MOB THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A totally inclusive Theatre Company which specialises in Musical Theatre (encompassing: Acting, Singing, Movement, British Sign Language, Confidence, Self-Esteem and Wellbeing). We try to make a difference to those who need a difference in West Norfolk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 14 December 2012: Standard registration
- LHMTC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY ROCK | Chair | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
EMILY BUTLER | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
LES MILES | Trustee | 12 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.89k | £21.89k | £3.14k | £12.00k | £7.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.80k | £17.35k | £13.14k | £9.27k | £10.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £800 | £1.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/10/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK IN THE ARTS GENERALLY AND MORE PARTICULARLY BY WAY OF EXAMPLE ONLY AND NOT LIMITATION THE ARTS OF THEATRE, DANCE, MUSIC, DRAMA, SINGING, POETRY AND DESIGN AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS AND PUBLIC PERFORMANCES
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 King Street
King's Lynn
Norfolk
PE30 1HE
- Phone:
- 07769177501
- Email:
- info@lhmtc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window