BARKING KIDZ KLUB

Charity number: 1150059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £4.38k £3.60k £4.14k £3.95k £3.70k
Total expenditure £5.70k £7.35k £5.23k £4.01k £3.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A