Accounts and annual returns PRACTICAL TOOLS INITIATIVE LIMITED

Charity number: 1152292
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 18 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 18 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 02 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 September 2020 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 29 September 2020 121 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 13 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 13 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window