Accounts and annual returns Wales and Africa Health Links Network

Charity number: 1155020
Charity reporting is overdue by 79 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 79 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 79 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 March 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required