Financial history Wales and Africa Health Links Network

Charity number: 1155020
Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £24 £70 £0 £75 £320
Total expenditure £0 £94 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A