Trustees Wales and Africa Health Links Network
Charity number: 1155020
Charity reporting is overdue by 87 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Kelechi Nnoaham | Chair | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julia Terry | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Towera Luhanga | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Robson | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Allison Williams | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Zed Sibanda | Trustee | 22 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zainab Nur | Trustee | 24 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bernadette Fuge | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr GORDON HOWARD LEWIS | Trustee | 13 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr MILES PAUL MYRES | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.