Trustees FUSION HOUSING KIRKLEES LTD

Charity number: 1151483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MOIRA VANGROVE Chair 29 October 2013
None on record
Mark Leith Trustee 30 September 2019
None on record
Kevin Knott Trustee 30 September 2019
None on record
Christopher Ledwon Trustee 30 September 2019
None on record
Nicholas Tarren Trustee 23 April 2018
None on record
ERIC CANNELL Trustee 27 October 2014
None on record
DENNIS HULLOCK Trustee 29 October 2013
None on record
DANIEL PATRICK MORIARTY Trustee 29 October 2013
None on record
CLIFFORD JOSEPH LORENZELLI Trustee 29 October 2013
None on record
SIMON DAVID SMITH Trustee 29 October 2013
None on record
CAROLE PATTINSON Trustee 11 January 2013
None on record