Accounts and annual returns MERTON HALL RECREATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1150528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required