Trustees MERTON HALL RECREATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1150528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CARL MAXWELL RAWLINGS Chair 21 December 2012
MERTON HALL RECREATION CENTRE
Recently registered
Sandra Aynsley Trustee 04 November 2021
None on record
John Bunting Trustee 15 September 2021
MERTON HALL RECREATION CENTRE
Recently registered
Nirmal Sehgal Nirmal Sehgal Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record
Peter Ford Peter Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record
Anthony Michael Hodson Tony Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record
PETER RILEY Trustee 24 July 2018
MERTON HALL RECREATION CENTRE
Recently registered
Sufi Ahmed Trustee 17 July 2017
NEWCASTLE BANGLADESHI ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
MERTON HALL RECREATION CENTRE
Recently registered
JENNIFER BARBARA HARDY Trustee 17 July 2017
None on record
Mrs Val Riley Trustee 23 July 2015
MERTON HALL RECREATION CENTRE
Recently registered
Audrey Murray Trustee 14 January 2015
MERTON HALL RECREATION CENTRE
Recently registered
Ian Charles Woodrow Trustee 06 March 2014
MERTON HALL RECREATION CENTRE
Recently registered
CHRISTINE ANNE GREENWELL Trustee 21 December 2012
COATES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MERTON HALL RECREATION CENTRE
Recently registered
JEAN LINDA FINCH Trustee 21 December 2012
MERTON HALL RECREATION CENTRE
Recently registered