Trustees RUGBY LEAGUE CARES

Charity number: 1150763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEVIN SINFIELD Trustee 27 January 2022
THE RFL BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
Victoria Jane Sinacola Trustee 09 August 2023
None on record
GARY HETHERINGTON Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Beth Sutcliffe Trustee 28 April 2022
THE RFL BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
Jane Walton Trustee 29 October 2020
CASTLEFORD HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
WELL WOMEN CENTRE
Overdue by 32 days
Karen Elizabeth Moorhouse Trustee 30 January 2020
THE RFL BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
Neville Alan Smith Trustee 30 January 2020
None on record
David Hinchcliffe Trustee 04 December 2018
None on record
TIMOTHY LAWRENCE ADAMS Trustee 14 November 2012
THE RFL BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time