THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK HIGHCLIFFE DIOCESE OF WINCHESTER

Charity number: 1150249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £115.42k £118.79k £193.80k £119.72k £228.31k
Total expenditure £140.31k £122.98k £119.66k £137.65k £168.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £19.85k