THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK HIGHCLIFFE DIOCESE OF WINCHESTER

Charity number: 1150249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LIZ MORTON Trustee 24 April 2018 None on record
COLIN WILLIAM CHATTEN Trustee 17 December 2012 None on record
DIANA FAUNCE Trustee 16 May 2017 None on record
MAUREEN RHODA STRINGER Trustee 16 May 2017 None on record
ANNETTE CHEESEMAN Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
PROFESSOR MARK HADFIELD Trustee 08 May 2018
HIGHCLIFFE CHARITIES Received: On time
MIKE GOODMAN Trustee 27 April 2014 None on record
BOB GILBERTSON Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
JACKIE PETERSON Trustee 17 December 2012 None on record
SUSAN MARGARET LYONETTE Trustee 08 May 2013 None on record
Rev Veronica Mary Brown MA,MBA Chair 23 September 2020
HIGHCLIFFE CHARITIES Received: On time
ANN NASH Trustee 17 December 2012 None on record
MICHAEL WILLIAMS Trustee 08 May 2018 None on record
DAVID CANNINGS Trustee 23 April 2017
ROTARY CLUB OF HIGHCLIFFE-ON-SEA TRUST FUND Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARK'S CHURCH HIGHCLIFFE Received: On time
FRANCIS BRAY Trustee 01 June 2016 None on record
SANDRA MARGARET CHANNON Trustee 02 April 2019 None on record
PAUL CHRISTOPHER OASTLER Trustee 17 December 2012
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARK'S CHURCH HIGHCLIFFE Received: On time
SUSAN GOODMAN Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
JOHN HEIGHES Trustee 17 December 2012 None on record