UNITED KINGDOM PUNJAB HERITAGE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UKPHA works to promote awareness and learning in the field of Punjabi heritage, which we achieve this through a variety of activities including exhibitions, documentaries, articles, social media, talks and lectures and workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 July 2013: Standard registration
- UKPHA (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMANDEEP MADRA | Chair | 19 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
AMANROOP RAHAL | Trustee | 27 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
NAVINDER GROVER | Trustee | 27 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
HARDEEP BATH BSc Hons | Trustee | 19 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
KANWAL MADRA MENG | Trustee | 19 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.45k | £23.02k | £32.48k | £15.06k | £40.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.73k | £22.37k | £28.05k | £19.93k | £39.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 26 January 2023 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | 26 January 2023 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 05 April 2021 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | 05 April 2021 | 155 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 FEB 2007 AS AMENDED ON 04/06/2013
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION, SPECIFICALLY TO INCREASE PUBLIC LEARNING AND KNOWLEDGE ABOUT PUNJABI HISTORY, ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
UKPHA
483 GREEN LANES
LONDON
N13 4BS
- Phone:
- 02033719498
- Email:
- info@ukpha.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window