Accounts and annual returns HEALTH AND HOPE UK

Charity number: 1151105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window