Financial history HEALTH AND HOPE UK

Charity number: 1151105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £373.94k £398.42k £582.77k £608.19k £554.19k
Total expenditure £331.01k £391.26k £526.55k £624.77k £451.72k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £21.20k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £581.88k £607.27k £554.01k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £887 £922 £181
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £30.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £465.89k £535.49k £317.37k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £31.67k £62.61k £54.64k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 £400
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £28.99k £26.67k £79.72k