THE NEW BLENDWORTH CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing day provision for adults with learning disabilities through the medium of horticulture,outreach garden maintenance and other community activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £323,523 from 3 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 24 May 2013: Standard registration
- THE NEW BLENDWORTH CENTRE LTD. (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Humphries | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
JAMES TICKELL | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAMES CROWTER | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kim Marie O'Brien | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
BEV RILEY | Trustee | 23 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARK ANTHONY WILLS | Trustee | 23 January 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £359.15k | £322.90k | £356.46k | £392.29k | £442.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £340.54k | £318.61k | £330.78k | £377.70k | £407.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £263.27k | N/A | £251.91k | £299.58k | £323.52k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £249.75k | £33.35k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND WELFARE OF PERSONS WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AT THE NEW BLENDWORTH CENTRE AT BLENDWORTH IN HAMPSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
New Blendworth Centre Ltd
Blendworth Lane
Waterlooville
PO8 0AA
- Phone:
- 02392597443
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window